FL H0145 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on September 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 168
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 168
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Directs FWCC to establish pilot program for eradication of priority invasive species & submit report to Governor & Legislature; authorizes FWCC to enter into specified contracts.
Title
Nonnative Animals
Sponsors
House Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | House Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee | Rep. Halsey Beshears [R] | Rep. Kristin Jacobs [D] |
Rep. Holly Raschein [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Laid on Table, refer to SB 168 |
2018-03-06 | House | Substituted SB 168 |
2018-03-05 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18 |
2018-03-02 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18 |
2018-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-26 | House | Favorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/26/18, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2018-02-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/13/18, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall --Temporarily Postponed |
2018-02-07 | House | CS/CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-02-07 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-06 | House | CS/CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/06/18, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | CS by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-08 | House | Now in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-12-07 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-12-06 | House | CS by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-29 | House | On Committee agenda-- Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, 12/06/17, 2:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2017-10-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, 10/25/17, 9:00 am, 12 HOB --Temporarily Postponed |
2017-09-19 | House | Referred to Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-09-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S168 (Same As) 2018-03-26 - Chapter No. 2018-82