FL H0145 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Designates act "Florida Safe Harbor Act"; provides legislative intent & goals; provides for presumption that placement of child alleged to have been sexually exploited in short-term safe house is necessary; provides requirements for findings in shelter hearing relating to placement of allegedly sexually exploited child in safe house; requires assessment of certain children; provides for use of such assessments; provides requirements for safe houses receiving such children; requires annual report on safe-house placements, etc.
Title
Sexual Exploitation
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Drake [R] | Rep. Erik Fresen [R] | House Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee | Rep. Jeanette Nunez [R] |
Rep. Ari Porth [D] | Rep. Trudi Williams [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-29 | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee -HJ 366 | |
2011-03-28 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-23 | CS by Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 341 | |
2011-03-21 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee, 03/23/11, 1:00 pm, 12 HOB | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 19 | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to HHS Access Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 20 | |
2011-01-07 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0718 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
322 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 521 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |