FL H0143 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1964
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes OTTED to administer corporate income tax credits for spaceflight projects; increases annual tax credit cap relating to contaminated site rehabilitation; provides tax credit for certain research & development expenses; repeals emergency excise tax & related provisions; revises criteria for awarding tax credits & increases amount of credits to be awarded under entertainment industry financial incentive program; authorizes Martin County to apply to OTTED for designation of enterprise zone, etc. APPROPRIATION:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic Development

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#40 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#100 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1964
2011-05-07 In returning messages
2011-05-07 Amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) adopted -HJ 1950
2011-04-26 
2011-04-26 Conference Committee appointed: Representatives Precourt (Chair), Bernard, Dorworth, Holder, Ray -HJ 778
2011-04-07 In returning messages
2011-04-07 Received -SJ 450
2011-04-06 In Messages
2011-04-06 Read 2nd time -HJ 420
2011-04-01 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/06/11
2011-03-30 Favorable by- Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 1 -HJ 390
2011-03-28 Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Committee; Economic Affairs Committee
2011-03-25 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2011-03-22 CS by Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 325
2011-03-18 On Committee agenda-- Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee, 03/22/11, 12:00 pm, 12 HOB
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 19
2011-01-25 Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Appropriations Committee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 19
2011-01-07 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0790 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
142015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
213053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
213255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216138Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220153Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22016Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2201845Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220194Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220195Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220196Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2881045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2881254Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2881258Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288987Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2900055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29000726Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29000727Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29000728Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33430Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37630781Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624509Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62451055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
72011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
72041Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback