FL H0141 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-07 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires students & parents be informed of certain acceleration, academic & career planning options; requires personalized academic & career plan be developed in consultation with certified school counselor for certain students; requires certain information to be included in such plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Guidance Services on Academic and Career Planning

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-07House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2023-01-17HouseNow in Education Quality Subcommittee
2023-01-17HouseReferred to Education & Employment Committee
2023-01-17HouseReferred to Education Quality Subcommittee
2023-01-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S196 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Now in Rules
S240 (Similar To) 2023-03-15 - Now in Fiscal Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034156Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback