FL H0141 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises date of repeal of Florida Enterprise Zone Act.
Title
Florida Enterprise Zone Act
Sponsors
Sen. Bobby Powell [D] | Rep. Jose Diaz [R] | Rep. Erik Fresen [R] | Rep. MaryLynn Magar [R] |
Rep. Jeanette Nunez [R] | Rep. Sharon Pritchett [D] | Rep. Jimmie Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2013-11-05 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2013-10-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0472 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/141 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0141/BillText/Filed/PDF |