FL H0141 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 2 -HJ 793
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 2 -HJ 793
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for relief of William Dillon, who was wrongfully incarcerated for 27 years; provides appropriation to compensate William Dillon for his wrongful incarceration; directs CFO to draw warrant for purchase of annuity; provides for waiver of certain tuition & fees; provides conditions for payment; provides that act does not waive certain defenses or increase state's liability; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs; provides that certain benefits are void upon any future finding that William Dillon is not innocent of alleged crime. CLAIM WITH APPROPRIATION:
Title
Relief/William Dillon/State of Florida
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 2 -HJ 793 | |
2012-02-23 | Substituted CS/SB 2 | |
2012-02-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/12 | |
2012-02-21 | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 -HJ 689 | |
2012-02-20 | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 673 | |
2012-02-17 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/21/12, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall | |
2012-02-17 | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 683 | |
2012-02-15 | PCS on Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/17/12, 8:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 18 | |
2011-10-03 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 18 | |
2011-09-13 | Filed |