FL H0139 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Chapter No. 2023-161
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Chapter No. 2023-161
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires analysis of VETS Program; revises duties of DVA & Florida Is For Veterans, Inc., to include assistance to veterans' spouses; revises purpose & duties of VETS Program to include assistance to veterans' spouses; requires Florida Is For Veterans, Inc., to assist veterans or their spouses in accessing employment & licensure in health care professions; requires DOH to waive certain fees for veterans & their spouses; requires appropriate board or DOH to expedite health care licensure applications submitted by veterans; establishes Office of Veteran Licensure Services; provides appropriations & authorizes positions.
Title
Benefits, Training, and Employment for Veterans and Their Spouses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#156 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#156 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | Chapter No. 2023-161 | |
2023-05-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-05-22 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-05-02 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2023-05-02 | House | In Messages |
2023-05-02 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 858 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-20 | Senate | In Messages |
2023-04-20 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 |
2023-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-20 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-13 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023) |
2023-04-11 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-11 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-04-10 | House | Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-04-06 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2023-03-29 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2023-03-29 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-28 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-28 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-28 | House | Reported out of Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-24 | House | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda |
2023-03-20 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-20 | House | Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-03-20 | House | Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-03-16 | House | Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-14 | House | Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-03-13 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-03-11 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-11 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-11 | House | Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-03-09 | House | Favorable with CS by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-07 | House | PCS added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda |
2023-02-16 | House | PCS added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda |
2023-01-17 | House | Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-01-17 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-01-17 | House | Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S858 (Same As) 2023-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 139 (Ch. 2023-161)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
288 | 0001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
292 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
295 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
295 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 0241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 0242 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |