FL H0137 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits persons licensed to provide professional counseling & various practitioners who perform counseling as part of their professional training from engaging in conversion therapy with person who is younger than specified age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conversion Therapy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11HouseDied in Health Quality Subcommittee
2016-01-12HouseIntroduced
2015-09-24HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2015-09-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0258 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
456064Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback