FL H0123 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires, rather than authorizes, each district school board to provide disability history & awareness instruction in all K-12 public schools; requires each public school to establish disability history & awareness advisory council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disability Awareness

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in K-12 Subcommittee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-01-08HouseReferred to K-12 Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2014-12-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0152 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10034205Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback