FL H0117 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 16 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-29 - Now in Government Operations Subcommittee
Pending: House Government Operations Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides presumption to specified workers that impairment of health caused by COVID-19 or infectious disease happened in line of duty; requires certain actions in order to be entitled to presumption; requires emergency rescue or public safety workers to file incident or accident report under certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Communicable and Infectious Diseases

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-29HouseNow in Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-09-29HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2021-09-29HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-09-29HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-09-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H53 (Similar To) 2021-09-14 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S774 (Same As) 2021-11-16 - Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
112181Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback