FL H0109 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases state minimum wage; prohibits employer from paying employee at rate less than state minimum wage; removes limitation restricting application of state minimum wage only to individuals entitled to receive federal minimum wage.
Title
State Minimum Wage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-09-10 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2015-08-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0006 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/109 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0109/BillText/Filed/PDF |