FL H0107 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 17 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Placed on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires law enforcement officer to inform motor vehicle operator of certain rights; prohibits certain actions by officer; requires officer to record race & ethnicity of violator when issuing citation; requires law enforcement agencies to report such information to DHSMV; requires DHSMV to annually report certain data to Governor & Legislature; removes requirement that enforcement be accomplished as secondary action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Texting While Driving

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-04HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2019-04-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/04/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-28HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-28HouseCS referred to State Affairs Committee
2019-03-28HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Appropriations Committee
2019-03-27HouseCS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-27HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-26HouseCS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-03HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee
2018-12-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S76 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - CS/CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
H45 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Withdrawn prior to introduction

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316305Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback