FL H0107 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 30 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 224 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 224 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to procedures for declaring special districts inactive; specifies level of detail required for local governmental entity's proposed budget; revises provisions for local governmental entity's audit & annual financial reports; requires local governmental entity's budget to be posted online; revises budgetary guidelines for district school boards.
Title
Local Government Accountability
Sponsors
Sen. Daphne Campbell [D] | Rep. Fredrick Costello [R] | House Government Operations Subcommittee | Sen. Debbie Mayfield [R] |
Rep. Michelle Rehwinkel Vasilinda [D] | Rep. Jimmie Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 224 (Ch. | |
2011-05-02 | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading -HJ 1000 | |
2011-04-29 | Read 2nd time -HJ 959 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/11 | |
2011-04-01 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 399 | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 399 | |
2011-03-29 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 03/31/11, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall | |
2011-03-28 | Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Committee | |
2011-03-25 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-23 | CS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 325 | |
2011-03-21 | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/23/11, 8:00 am, 306 HOB | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 15 | |
2011-02-10 | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee -HJ 150 | |
2011-02-09 | Favorable by Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 150 | |
2011-02-02 | On Committee agenda-- Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 02/09/11, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 16 | |
2010-12-30 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0224 () 2011-05-04 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 851
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1011 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
129 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
129 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
129 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
129 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
129 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
129 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
129 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
189 | 4044 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
189 | 412 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
189 | 418 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
189 | 419 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
189 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
195 | 087 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
30 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 536 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |