FL H0105 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises required health education in public schools to include information regarding dangers & signs of human trafficking; authorizes student to opt out of specified portion of health education; & requires DLA to develop human trafficking awareness campaigns.
Title
Human Trafficking Education in Schools
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Hawkins-Williams [D] | Rep. Scott Plakon [R] | Rep. Fentrice Driskell [D] | Rep. Michael Gottlieb [D] |
Rep. Emily Slosberg-King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-09-23 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Education Committee |
2019-09-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S154 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/105 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/105/BillText/Filed/PDF |