FL H0105 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Introduced on August 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2016-185)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies acts that constitute trafficking in food assistance benefits; prohibits specified acts relating to possession & sale of electronic benefit transfer cards for food assistance benefits issued to other persons; removes reference to s. 414.39(2), F.S., relating to unauthorized use, possession, forgery, or alteration of certain food assistance program & Medicaid identification, from offense severity ranking chart; reenacts provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Assistance Fraud

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-02HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2016-185)
2016-02-02HouseSubstituted CS/SB 218
2016-01-29HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/02/16
2016-01-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-01-21HouseFavorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 2
2016-01-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 01/21/16, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2016-01-13HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2016-01-13HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 6 NAYS 4
2016-01-12HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2016-01-12HouseIntroduced
2016-01-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/13/16, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
2015-11-17HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2015-11-05HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-11-04HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 3
2015-10-28HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 11/04/15, 10:30 am, Sumner Hall
2015-09-10HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2015-08-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0218 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Chapter No. 2016-185

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100291Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41439Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41441Amended CodeSee Bill Text
772102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback