FL H0105 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Veto Message received (2015 Special Session A)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises applicability of Marvin B. Clayton Firefighters Pension Trust Fund Act; authorizes municipality that provides fire protection services under an interlocal agreement with another municipality to impose excise tax on property insurance premiums; requires municipal services taxing units to provide Division of Retirement with certified copy of ordinance assessing & imposing certain taxes; revises provisions relating to limitation of disbursement; authorizes municipal services taxing unit, under certain conditions, to revoke participation & cease to receive property insurance premium taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Publicly Funded Retirement Programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#155 (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-18HouseVeto Message received (2015 Special Session A)
2015-06-16 Vetoed by Governor
2015-06-01 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-27HouseOrdered enrolled
2015-04-27SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2015-04-27SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-24SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-24SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-24SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 216
2015-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-24SenateWithdrawn from Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations
2015-04-21SenateReceived
2015-04-21SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations
2015-04-21SenateIn Messages
2015-04-16HouseCS passed; YEAS 110 NAYS 1
2015-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-15HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-13HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/15/15
2015-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-04-08HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2015-04-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/08/15, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2015-03-31HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2015-03-31HouseFavorable by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 1
2015-03-27HouseOn Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 03/31/15, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
2015-03-19HouseNow in Finance and Tax Committee
2015-03-18HouseFavorable by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-03-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 03/18/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2015-03-08HouseNow in Local Government Affairs Subcommittee
2015-03-05HouseCS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-05HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-04HouseCS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-03-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/04/15, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall
2015-01-08HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; State Affairs Committee
2014-12-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0216 (Same As) 2015-04-24 - Laid on Table

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
175041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
175101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
175111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
175122Amended CodeSee Bill Text
175351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
175411Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback