FL H0105 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies order for applying tax credit for employment of homeless; redefines term "adjusted federal income" to include adjustment for tax credit; provides tax credit for corporation that hires homeless person residing in transitional, permanent supportive, or permanent housing facility; specifies information that must be provided to DOR when applying for credit; provides for carryover of unused credits; requires that application be filed with department by specified date each year; provides penalties for fraudulently claiming tax credit; limits total amount of tax credits that may be granted per taxable year; authorizes department to adopt rules; provides for expiration of tax credit; requires that department collect data.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment of the Homeless

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Died in Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
2012-01-10 Introduced -HJ 14
2011-09-15 Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 14
2011-08-26 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22013Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback