FL H0105 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1101
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that person who violates open house party statute second or subsequent time commits misdemeanor of first degree; provides that person commits misdemeanor of first degree if violation of open house party statute causes or contributes to causing serious bodily injury or death to minor, or causes or contributes to causing serious bodily injury or death to another person as result of minor's consumption of alcohol or drugs at open house party, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Open House Parties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#380 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-03 Ordered enrolled -HJ 1101
2011-05-03 Withdrawn from Regulated Industries; Criminal Justice; Budget -SJ 730
2011-04-29 In Messages
2011-04-29 Read 2nd time -HJ 901
2011-04-27 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/11
2011-03-14 Placed on Calendar -HJ 219
2011-03-11 Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2011-03-10 CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 -HJ 216
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 15
2011-01-25 Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 1 -HJ 149
2011-01-18 On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/25/11, 9:00 am, 404 HOB
2011-01-10 Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 15
2010-12-29 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0746 () 2011-05-03 - Read 2nd time -SJ 730

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
856015Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback