FL H0103 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DOR to convene informal conference regarding delinquencies in payment of tax, interest, or penalties; requires DOR to compromise taxpayer's liability for taxes & interest under specific conditions; creates rebuttable presumption if taxpayer does not provide specified records; authorizes DOR to settle or compromise penalties; requires DOR to give notice of amount of delinquency to informally resolve delinquency; specifies taxpayer may receive assistance from taxpayers' rights advocate; requires DOR to issue notice of intent to garnish.
Title
Taxpayer Delinquencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Ways & Means Committee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-01-10 | House | Now in Ways & Means Committee |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2023-01-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S182 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
213 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/103 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/103/BillText/Filed/PDF |