FL H0095 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes limitation on amount of such proceeds to be deposited into State Housing Trust Fund each fiscal year; retroactively repeals conflicting version of statute.
Title
Distribution of Proceeds/Excise Taxes on Documents
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Jenne [D] | Rep. Martin Kiar [D] | Rep. Mark Pafford [D] | Sen. Kevin Rader [D] |
Rep. Ron Saunders [D] | Rep. Elaine Schwartz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Finance & Tax Council | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development -HJ 00016 | |
2009-10-01 | Referred to Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development | |
2009-09-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0665 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - In returning messages; Died in returning Messages
S1250 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Community Affairs
S1432 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Community Affairs
S0262 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00914; Amendment(s) adopted (815630, 798042, 457750, 256110, 143790) -SJ 00914; Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 665 (Died in House returning Messages) -SJ 00914; Laid on Table -SJ 00914
S1250 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Community Affairs
S1432 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Community Affairs
S0262 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00914; Amendment(s) adopted (815630, 798042, 457750, 256110, 143790) -SJ 00914; Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 665 (Died in House returning Messages) -SJ 00914; Laid on Table -SJ 00914