FL H0089 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-42
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-42
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that name & identity of birth parent, adoptive parent, & adoptee may be disclosed from adoption records without court order.
Title
Adoption Records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#534 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#534 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | Chapter No. 2020-42 | |
2020-06-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-03 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-13 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-13 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 2 |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 302 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-03-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-04 | House | CS passed; YEAS 119 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time -HJ |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20 |
2020-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-20 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-18 | House | CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-01-30 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 01/29/20, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-06 | House | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-11-06 | House | Favorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2019-10-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 11/06/19, 9:30 am, Mashburn Hall |
2019-09-23 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-08-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S302 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 89