FL H0083 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain notices to include agency website address for specified purpose; requires agency to prepare statement of estimated regulatory costs before adopting or amending rule other than emergency rule; requires agency to prepare statement of estimated regulatory costs before repealing rule in certain circumstances; requires DOS to include on Florida Administrative Register website agency website addresses where statements of estimated regulatory costs can be viewed.
Title
Agency Rulemaking
Sponsors
House Government Accountability Committee | House Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee | Rep. Ross Spano [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#543 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Received |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2018-02-07 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-01-31 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-01-31 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (755203) |
2018-01-31 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-25 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/31/18 |
2018-01-16 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-12 | House | CS/CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time |
2018-01-12 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-11 | House | CS/CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-09 | House | CS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-01-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 01/11/18, 10:30 am, Morris Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-15 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2017-11-15 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/15/17, 8:30 am, 116 Knott Building |
2017-10-16 | House | Now in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-10-13 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-10-11 | House | CS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2017-10-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 10/11/17, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2017-08-30 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-08-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S912 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
120 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 541 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |