FL H0077 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes use of purple paint marks to identify "no trespassing" area; provides requirements for marks; requires specified signage.
Title
Trespassing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 12 | |
2011-09-15 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 12 | |
2011-08-08 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
260 | 0125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
810 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
810 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/77 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0077/BillText/Filed/HTML |