FL H0069 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises minimum licensing standards relating to transportation safety for child care facilities & child care homes; requires DCF to suspend license of child care facility or child care home when child dies under certain conditions.
Title
Child Care Facilities
Sponsors
House Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee | Rep. Bruce Antone [D] | Rep. Patricia Hawkins-Williams [D] | Rep. James Bush [D] |
Rep. John Cortes [D] | Rep. Amy Mercado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-22 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-21 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-21 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-20 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 03/20/19, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-12-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S94 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
402 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 310 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |