FL H0069 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Commerce and Tourism, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9057 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Urges Congress to recognize month of May as "Haitian American Heritage Month."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Haitian American Heritage Month

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11SenateDied in Commerce and Tourism, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9057 (Adopted)
2016-01-27SenateReceived
2016-01-27SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2016-01-26SenateIn Messages
2016-01-26HouseCS adopted
2016-01-26HouseRead 2nd time
2016-01-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/26/16
2016-01-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-01-13HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 10 NAYS 6
2016-01-12HouseCS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee read 1st time
2016-01-12HouseIntroduced
2016-01-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 01/13/16, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
2015-10-28HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2015-10-12HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-10-08HouseCS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 10 NAYS 3
2015-09-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 10/07/15, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2015-09-10HouseReferred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; State Affairs Committee
2015-08-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0333 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in State Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9057 (Adopted)
S0568 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Commerce and Tourism, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9057 (Adopted)
S0600 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9057 (Adopted)
H9057 (Similar To) 2016-03-02 - Adopted by Publication

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback