FL H0067 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes local governmental bodies to designate specified number of safe-haven facilities in each county based upon population size; authorizes approval of local government buildings to serve as safe-haven facilities; limits liability of local governmental entities that provide safe-haven facility; limits actions against state or local government related to transactions taking place at safe-haven facility.
Title
Classified Advertisement Websites
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-25 | House | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-25 | House | CS referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-01-22 | House | CS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-20 | House | CS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 2 |
2016-01-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 01/20/16, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-09-10 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2015-08-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1152 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages