FL H0061 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Choice and Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires charter school applicant to provide evidence of surety bond or secured escrow account by specified date to cover first-year operation costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charter Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Choice and Innovation Subcommittee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2014-12-19HouseReferred to Choice and Innovation Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2014-12-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0720 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
S1036 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
S1336 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002331Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback