FL H0055 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on August 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to membership of & appointments & reappointments to Assistive Technology Advisory Council; requires council members to select chair from among council membership; revises provisions relating to committees appointed to perform council's functions; expands council's functions to include fundraising activities.
Title
Assistive Technology Advisory Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - House Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - House Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Laid on Table, refer to SB 418 |
2022-03-03 | House | Substituted SB 418 |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) |
2022-02-23 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-23 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-23 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Favorable by Education & Employment Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2022-02-03 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-02-01 | House | Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-18 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-18 | House | Reported out of Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee |
2022-01-18 | House | Favorable by Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | Added to Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-09-17 | House | Now in Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee |
2021-09-17 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-09-17 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-09-17 | House | Referred to Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee |
2021-08-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S418 (Same As) 2022-03-28 - Chapter No. 2022-18