FL H0039 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires person cited for moving violation while using handheld mobile telecommunications device to appear before designated official; provides additional penalties; provides duties of law enforcement officers with respect to such citations.
Title
Traffic Safety
Sponsors
Rep. John Julien [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 10 | |
2011-09-15 | Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 11 | |
2011-07-07 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
318 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/39 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0039/BillText/Filed/HTML |