FL H0037 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that a direct primary care agreement does not constitute insurance & provides criteria for such agreements.
Title
Direct Primary Care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#647 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Fiscal Policy |
2016-03-02 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-03-02 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-01 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (141991, 576567) |
2016-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-26 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/16 |
2016-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-28 | House | CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2016-01-28 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-27 | House | CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 01/27/16, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2016-01-21 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | CS by Finance and Tax Committee read 1st time |
2016-01-20 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-14 | House | CS by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 01/14/16, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-11-20 | House | Now in Finance and Tax Committee |
2015-11-19 | House | Favorable by Select Committee on Affordable Healthcare Access; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 |
2015-11-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Select Committee on Affordable Healthcare Access, 11/19/15, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2015-08-27 | House | Referred to Select Committee on Affordable Healthcare Access; Finance and Tax Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-08-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0132 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
S0178 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224)
S0212 (Similar To) 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224)
S0178 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224)
S0212 (Similar To) 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224)