FL H0029 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to written notification in absence of prospectus; clarifies that purchaser of mobile home may assume seller's prospectus & terms contained in prospectus under certain conditions; authorizes mobile home park owner to increase rental amount upon expiration of assumed rental agreement subject to conditions; provides notification requirements; requires mobile home park owner to disclose certain information to purchaser; requires mobile home park owner & purchaser to sign prospectus election form; provides form; requires mobile home park owner to provide copy of election form to purchaser & maintain copy for certain period.
Title
Mobile Home Park Lot Tenancies
Sponsors
House Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee | Rep. Raymond Pilon [R] | Rep. Katie Edwards [D] | Rep. Sharon Pritchett [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Roberson [R] | Rep. Charles Van Zant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2014-03-20 | House | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2014-03-19 | House | CS by Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-19 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-18 | House | CS by Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-14 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee, 03/18/14, 12:30 pm, 12 HOB |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2013-10-07 | House | Referred to Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-08-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0114 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Regulated Industries
H0907 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
S0874 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Regulated Industries
H0907 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
S0874 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Regulated Industries
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
723 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 059 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/29 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0029/BillText/Filed/PDF |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0029/BillText/c1/PDF |