FL H0027 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Chapter No. 2015-85
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Chapter No. 2015-85
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for DHSMV to accept military identification card to meet certain requirements for issuance of driver license or identification card; authorizes word "Veteran" to be exhibited on driver license or identification card of veteran.
Title
Driver Licenses & Identification Cards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#98 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#87 (Y: 37 N: 79 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#98 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#87 (Y: 37 N: 79 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Chapter No. 2015-85 | |
2015-06-02 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-05-18 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-24 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-24 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 240 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Rules |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Rules |
2015-04-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-04-09 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-08 | House | Amendment(s) failed (268031) |
2015-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-06 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/08/15 |
2015-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 03/19/15, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2015-03-12 | House | Now in Economic Affairs Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Favorable by Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 03/12/15, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2015-03-08 | House | Now in Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee |
2015-03-05 | House | CS by Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-03-05 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-04 | House | CS by Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee, 03/04/15, 1:30 pm, 116 Knott Building |
2014-12-19 | House | Referred to Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee; Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2014-11-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0240 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 27 (Ch. 2015-85)
S1398 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 27 (Ch. 2015-85)
S1398 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 27 (Ch. 2015-85)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
322 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |