FL H0023 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-11-2)
Status: Introduced on August 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 70 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each public school, including charter schools, to implement a panic alert system for specified purposes; providing requirements for such system; providing an appropriation, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Panic Alarms in Public Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseLaid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 70 passed
2020-03-09HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2020-03-06HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2020-03-05HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-05HouseAmendment(s) adopted (647803)
2020-03-05HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-02HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20
2020-02-26HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-26HouseFavorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2020-02-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
2020-02-10HouseCS/CS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-02-10HouseNow in Education Committee
2020-02-07HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-04HouseCS/CS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-01-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall
2020-01-24HouseNow in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-01-23HouseCS by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-23HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-01-21HouseCS by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-01-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-09-23HouseReferred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-08-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S70 (Same As) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-145

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100607Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback