FL H0021 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises applicability of certain definitions regarding state group insurance program; defines term "plan year"; authorizes program to include additional benefits; authorizes employee to use certain portion of state's contribution to purchase additional & supplemental benefits; provides for program to offer health plans in specified benefit coverage levels; provides for DMS to develop plan for implementation of benefit levels; provides reporting requirements; authorizes additional benefits to be included in program; provides that DMS shall contract with at least one entity that provides comprehensive pricing & inclusive services for surgery & other medical procedures; provides contract & reporting requirements; provides for DMS to establish 3-year price transparency pilot project in certain areas of state; provides project & reporting requirements; directs DMS to contract with independent benefits consultant; provides requirements for & duties of consultant; provides reporting requirement; directs DMS to provide premium alternatives to Governor & Legislature by specified date; provides criteria for calculating premium alternatives; establishes premiums for participants for specified plans & coverage periods; provides appropriation & authorizes positions; provides for construction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Group Insurance Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#420 (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-19SenateDied in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2015-06-15SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2015-06-15SenateReferences corrected to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations
2015-06-15SenateOriginal reference(s)- removed: Health Policy
2015-06-12SenateReceived
2015-06-12SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations
2015-06-12SenateIn Messages
2015-06-12HousePassed; YEAS 71 NAYS 28
2015-06-12HouseRead 3rd time
2015-06-11HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-06-11HouseRead 2nd time
2015-06-10HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/11/15
2015-06-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-06-10HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 5
2015-06-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 06/10/15, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2015-06-01HouseReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2015-06-01HouseIntroduced
2015-05-27HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
110123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11012303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11012304Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback