FL H0021 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 106 (Ch. 2014-7)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 106 (Ch. 2014-7)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes governing body of county to determine available benefits of county employees; provides for applicability of certain provisions relating to Florida Retirement System.
Title
County Employees
Sponsors
House Government Operations Subcommittee | Rep. Elizabeth Porter [R] | Rep. Katie Edwards [D] | Rep. Dave Hood [R] |
Rep. Daniel Raulerson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 106 (Ch. 2014-7) |
2014-04-09 | House | Substituted CS/SB 106 |
2014-04-07 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/09/14 |
2014-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/13/14, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2014-03-07 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2014-03-06 | House | Favorable by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | House | CS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 03/06/14, 10:00 am, Webster Hall |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-01-27 | House | Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-01-14 | House | CS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-01-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 01/14/14, 2:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2013-10-07 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2013-08-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0106 (Similar To) 2014-05-14 - Chapter No. 2014-7