FL H0021 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates Florida Firearms Freedom Act; provides legislative findings & definitions; provides that specified firearms, firearm accessories, & ammunition for personal use manufactured in state are not subject to federal law or regulation, etc.
Title
Regulation of Firearms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Policy Council; Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00011 | |
2009-10-01 | Referred to Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Policy Council; Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council | |
2009-07-06 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0098 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary