FL H0013 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits sports franchise from constructing, reconstructing, renovating, or improving facility on leased public land; requires lease of facility on public land by sports franchise or sale of public land for sports franchise facility be at fair market value; provides requirements for contract to fund construction, reconstruction, renovation, or improvement of facility; specifies act does not impair certain contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sports Franchise Facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#507 (Y: 75 N: 27 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Commerce and Tourism
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-31SenateReceived
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2018-01-24SenateIn Messages
2018-01-12HousePassed; YEAS 75 NAYS 27
2018-01-12HouseRead 3rd time
2018-01-11HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-01-11HouseRead 2nd time 300
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/11/18
2017-10-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-10-10HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 6
2017-10-03HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 10/10/17, 9:30 am, Morris Hall
2017-09-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 09/12/17, 10:00 am, Morris Hall --Meeting cancelled
2017-08-30HouseReferred to Government Accountability Committee
2017-08-30HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S352 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28811633Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback