FL H0013 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes counties to impose an additional surcharge on lease or rental of motor vehicles; requires referendum approval.
Title
Rental Car Surcharges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2013-10-07 | House | Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2013-08-22 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/13 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0013/BillText/Filed/PDF |