FL H0013 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1243
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1243
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for lease of sovereignty submerged lands for private residential single-family docks & piers, private residential multifamily docks & piers, & private residential multislip docks; provides for term of lease & lease fees; provides for inspection of such docks, piers, & related structures by DEP; clarifies authority of Board of Trustees of the Internal Improvement Trust Fund & DEP to impose additional fees & requirements; provides appropriation. APPROPRIATION:
Title
Sovereignty Submerged Lands
Sponsors
Rep. James Frishe [R] | Sen. Gayle Harrell [R] | Sen. Debbie Mayfield [R] | Rep. William Snyder [R] |
Rep. Trudi Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#963 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#963 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1243 | |
2012-03-08 | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 964 | |
2012-03-08 | Withdrawn from Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget -SJ 964 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget -SJ 811 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 811 | |
2012-02-29 | In Messages | |
2012-02-29 | Passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 0 -HJ 938 | |
2012-02-29 | Read 3rd time -HJ 938 | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-28 | Read 2nd time -HJ 891 | |
2012-02-24 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/12 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 738 | |
2012-02-22 | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 738 | |
2012-02-20 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/22/12, 9:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2012-02-14 | Now in State Affairs Committee -HJ 601 | |
2012-02-14 | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 601 | |
2012-02-10 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/14/12, 1:15 pm, 306 HOB | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 9 | |
2011-11-15 | Now in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 172 | |
2011-11-15 | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 172 | |
2011-11-08 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 11/15/11, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall | |
2011-09-15 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 9 | |
2011-06-02 | Filed |