FL H0011 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises required information to be included in application for renewal of registration of employee organization; provides for revocation of certification under certain conditions; requires certain employee organizations to recertify as certified bargaining agents; provides nonapplicability with respect to employee organizations that represent or seek to represent certain employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor Organizations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#45 (Y: 75 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateDied in Commerce and Tourism
2017-05-05SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-04-05SenateReceived
2017-04-05SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations; Rules
2017-04-04SenateIn Messages
2017-03-30HousePassed; YEAS 75 NAYS 41
2017-03-30HouseRead 3rd time
2017-03-29HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-03-29HouseRead 2nd time
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/29/17
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-22HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 8
2017-03-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 03/22/17, 9:15 am, Morris Hall
2017-03-08HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2017-03-08HouseFavorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 3
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-03-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 03/08/17, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2017-03-01HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-02-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1292 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
447305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
447307Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback