FL H0011 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 230 (Ch. 2016-186)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Creates pilot projects in specified counties to provide personal devices to aid search-and-rescue efforts for persons with special needs; provides for administration of projects; requires reports; provides for expiration; provides appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Missing Persons with Special Needs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-23HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 230 (Ch. 2016-186)
2016-02-23HouseSubstituted CS/SB 230
2016-02-19HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/16
2016-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-02-17HouseCS/CS/CS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time
2016-02-17HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2016-02-16HouseCS/CS/CS/CS by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
2016-02-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/16/16, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall
2016-02-11HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2016-02-11HouseCS referred to Appropriations Committee
2016-02-10HouseCS/CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2016-02-10HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2016-02-10HouseCS/CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2016-02-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/10/16, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2016-02-02HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2016-02-01HouseCS/CS by Education Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2016-02-01HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2016-01-28HouseCS/CS by Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2016-01-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/28/16, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall
2016-01-12HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2016-01-12HouseIntroduced
2015-11-18HouseNow in Education Appropriations Subcommittee
2015-11-17HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-11-17HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-11-10HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 11/17/15, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2015-08-27HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2015-08-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0230 (Same As) 2016-04-06 - Chapter No. 2016-186

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
937041Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback