FL H0009 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires collectors to provide notice to consumers about data collection, sharing, & selling practices; provides consumers right to request data be disclosed, deleted, or corrected & to opt-in or opt-out of sale or sharing of data; provides nondiscrimination measures, methods for requesting data & opting-in or opting-out of sale or sharing of data, private cause of action, & enforcement; preempts regulation of consumer date collection, sharing, & selling to the state.
Title
Consumer Data Privacy
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Commerce Committee | Rep. Fiona McFarland [R] | Rep. Melony Bell [R] |
Rep. Anna Eskamani [D] | Sen. Erin Grall [R] | Rep. Bobby Payne [R] | Rep. Rick Roth [R] |
Rep. Jackie Toledo [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#653 (Y: 103 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#625 (Y: 29 N: 77 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#624 (Y: 14 N: 89 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#625 (Y: 29 N: 77 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#624 (Y: 14 N: 89 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary |
2022-03-02 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-03-02 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 103, NAYS 8 |
2022-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-01 | House | Amendment 801573 adopted |
2022-03-01 | House | Amendment 258739 Failed |
2022-03-01 | House | Amendment 217953 Failed |
2022-03-01 | House | Amendment 273229 Failed |
2022-03-01 | House | Amendment 848401 Failed |
2022-03-01 | House | Amendment 663407 Failed |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-24 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022) |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-24 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2022-02-14 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-11 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-11 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1565 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S1864 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
S1864 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
501 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 173 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |