FL H0009 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the corporation to enter into an agreement with the Department of Economic Opportunity for certain purposes and to use certain funds; repealing provisions relating to the State Economic Enhancement and Development Trust Fund and the Tourism Promotional Trust Fund, respectively; providing that the corporation is a direct-support organization of the department, rather than Enterprise Florida, Inc.; creating the Targeted Marketing Assistance Program to enhance the tourism business marketing of small, minority, rural, and agritourism businesses in the state; removing a requirement that Enterprise Florida, Inc., include a division related to tourism marketing, etc.
Title
Florida Tourism Industry Marketing Corporation
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Renner [R] | Rep. Mike LaRosa [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 80 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Received |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-03-22 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-03-10 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 80 NAYS 35 |
2017-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-03-09 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (544053, 652877) |
2017-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/17 |
2017-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-06 | House | Favorable by- Rules and Policy Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 2 |
2017-02-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Rules and Policy Committee, 03/06/17, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules and Policy Committee |
2017-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H889 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
S1076 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
H7005 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations
H5501 (Similar To) 2017-06-20 - Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
S1076 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
H7005 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations
H5501 (Similar To) 2017-06-20 - Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
201 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
272 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 0001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 1201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 1226 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 12265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 12266 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 124 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 826 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 904 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 92 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 923 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |