FL H0007 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-27 - On Committee agenda-- Pandemics and Public Emergencies Committee, 02/03/21, 1:15 pm, Sumner Hall
Pending: House Pandemics and Public Emergencies Committee Committee
Hearing: Feb 3 @ 1:15 pm in Sumner Hall
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides requirements for civil action based on COVID-19-related claim; provides that plaintiff has burden of proof in such action; provides statute of limitations; provides retroactive applicability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil Liability for Damages Relating to COVID-19

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-27HouseOn Committee agenda-- Pandemics and Public Emergencies Committee, 02/03/21, 1:15 pm, Sumner Hall
2021-01-13HouseNow in Pandemics and Public Emergencies Committee
2021-01-13HouseFavorable by Civil Justice and Property Rights Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 6
2021-01-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Property Rights Subcommittee, 01/13/21, 4:00 pm, Webster Hall
2021-01-06HouseReferred to Civil Justice and Property Rights Subcommittee; Pandemics and Public Emergencies Committee; Judiciary Committee
2021-01-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S72 (Same As) 2021-01-26 - Now in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
76838Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback