FL H0003 | 2021 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on November 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-19 - Chapter No. 2021-273; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1B (Ch. 2021-272)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on November 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-19 - Chapter No. 2021-273; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1B (Ch. 2021-272)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for employee complaints alleging private employer's violation of state law regarding employer COVID-19 vaccination policies or practices & all information held by DLA pursuant to active investigation of such complaints; defines "active"; specifies information that remains confidential & exempt after investigation is completed or ceases to be active; authorizes release of confidential & exempt information to governmental entities for specified purpose; provides for future repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./COVID-19 Vaccination Policies and Practices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#481 (Y: 85 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#475 (Y: 42 N: 77 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-11-15 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#481 (Y: 85 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#475 (Y: 42 N: 77 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-11-15 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-19 | Chapter No. 2021-273; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1B (Ch. 2021-272) | |
2021-11-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-11-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-11-17 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2021-11-17 | House | In Messages |
2021-11-17 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 26 NAYS 10 |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Substituted for SB 4-B |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Received |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-11-17 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-11-17 | House | CS passed; YEAS 85, NAYS 31 |
2021-11-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-11-16 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-11-16 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-11-16 | House | Amendment 077827 Failed |
2021-11-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-11-15 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-11-15 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-15 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (11/16/2021) |
2021-11-15 | House | Bill released to Rules Committee |
2021-11-15 | House | CS Filed |
2021-11-15 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-11-15 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2021-11-15 | House | Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee |
2021-11-15 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2021-11-08 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2021-11-08 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-11-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1 (Related) 2021-11-19 - Chapter No. 2021-272; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3B (Ch. 2021-273)
S4 (Same As) 2021-11-17 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3-B (Ch. 2021-273), HB 1-B (Ch. 2021-272)
S2 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1-B (Ch. 2021-272), CS/HB 3-B (Ch. 2021-273)
S4 (Same As) 2021-11-17 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3-B (Ch. 2021-273), HB 1-B (Ch. 2021-272)
S2 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1-B (Ch. 2021-272), CS/HB 3-B (Ch. 2021-273)