FL H0003 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions related to funding for seaport asset management plans and State Transportation Trust Fund for Intermodal Logistics Center Infrastructure Support Program; authorizes county or two or more contiguous counties to designate certain areas as freight logistics zone; provides that certain projects within freight logistics zones may be eligible for priority in state funding & certain incentive programs; provides evaluation criteria for freight logistics zones; requires certain entities to conduct review of continuity of operations plans and consistent asset management plans and authorizes such entities to develop all-hazards economic recovery plan & resumption of trade plan; revises provisions providing that certain public roads may be designated as port district roads; requires DOT to designate such roads with appropriate signage.
Title
Freight and Trade
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#642 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Received |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2014-04-23 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-04-23 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-18 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/14 |
2014-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/04/14, 9:30 am, Reed Hall |
2014-03-28 | House | Now in Economic Affairs Committee |
2014-03-27 | House | CS/CS by Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-26 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-24 | House | CS/CS by Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/24/14, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2014-03-04 | House | CS by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-01-16 | House | Now in Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee |
2014-01-13 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-01-09 | House | CS by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2013-12-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee, 01/09/14, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2013-10-07 | House | Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2013-08-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0136 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations
H7005 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-216, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 820 (Ch. 2014-228)
H7005 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-216, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 820 (Ch. 2014-228)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
311 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
311 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
311 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
311 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 525 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |