FL H0003 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cites act as "Electronic Gambling Prohibition & Community Protection Act"; transfers administration & enforcement of provisions relating to game promotions from DACS to DBPR; revises provisions relating to drawings by chance offered by nonprofit organizations, exceptions to prohibitions on lotteries, & procedures for operation of game promotion; prohibits use of certain devices operated by drawing entrants.
Title
Prohibition of Electronic Gambling Devices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1009 (Y: 72 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Regulated Industries | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Budget -SJ 838 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 838 | |
2012-03-01 | In Messages | |
2012-03-01 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 72 NAYS 43 -HJ 974 | |
2012-03-01 | Read 3rd time -HJ 974 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-29 | Read 2nd time -HJ 955 | |
2012-02-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/29/12 | |
2012-02-10 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 576 | |
2012-02-09 | CS/CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time -HJ 567 | |
2012-02-09 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-01 | CS/CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 6 -HJ 572 | |
2012-01-30 | PCS on Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 02/01/12, 8:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2012-01-26 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 296 | |
2012-01-25 | CS by Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 277 | |
2012-01-25 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-17 | CS by Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 5 -HJ 283 | |
2012-01-12 | PCS on Committee agenda-- Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee, 01/17/12, 12:30 pm, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 8 | |
2011-09-15 | Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 8 | |
2011-05-25 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
721 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
849 | 0935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
849 | 094 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
849 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
849 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
849 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
849 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
895 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
896 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
905 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |