DE SJR5 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Senate Joint Resolution creates a Delaware Motion Picture and Television Development Commission.
Title
Creating A Delaware Motion Picture And Television Development Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-26 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Assigned to Banking and Business Committee in Senate |