DE SCR50 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Concurrent Resolution designates the week of May 4, 2014 to May 10, 2014 as National Charter School Week and commends Delaware’s public charter schools for their efforts in educating Delaware students.
Title
Designating The Week Of May 4, 2014 To May 10, 2014 As National Charter School Week
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |