DE SCR31 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This concurrent resolution establishes the Veterans Higher Education Task Force to study and make findings and recommendations regarding veterans access to higher education in Delaware.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing The Veterans Higher Education Task Force To Study And Make Findings And Recommendations Regarding Veterans Access To Higher Education In Delaware.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-01-25 Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-01-25 Amendment HA 2 to SCR 31 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-01-25 Amendment HA 1 to SCR 31 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-01-17 Reported Out of Committee (Veterans Affairs) in House with 6 Favorable, 10 On Its Merits
2018-01-17 Amendment HA 2 to SCR 31 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-01-04 Amendment HA 1 to SCR 31 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-23 Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in House
2017-06-22 Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT
2017-06-22 Introduced in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback